If you like our website, you can help us on Patreon. Thanks for your support!
ABRO__VLG's player stats
Battles
13 408
Win rate
53.39%
WN8
1 690
WGR
6 851
WTR
6 841
EFF
1 291
Average tier
6.89
Spotting
1.42
Capture points
1.59
Defence points
0.83
K/D
1.31
D/R
1.28
Frags
0.97
Damage
1 089
Experience
573
Fragsmax
11
Damagemax
7 635
Experiencemax
2 536
Survival
26.16%
Accuracy
60.52%
Marks of Excellence
0/3/30
Mastery Badges
53/53/40/18
Session statistics
Vehicles
Total vehicles: 195
Displayed vehicles: 20
Vehicles with battles during the last three months are displayed
Nation | Class | Tier | Name | Battles | WR | DMG | K/D | FRG | MoE | XP | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
8 | ELC EVEN 90 | 594 | 56.90% | 830 | 0.97 | 0.74 | 2 | 875 | |||
8 | СУ-130ПМ | 190 | 51.58% | 1 743 | 1.90 | 1.24 | 1 | 820 | |||
8 | CS-52 LIS | 130 | 53.08% | 1 492 | 1.11 | 0.86 | 1 | 864 | |||
10 | 60TP Lewandowskiego | 118 | 54.24% | 2 463 | 1.51 | 1.03 | 1 | 880 | |||
10 | E 50 Ausf. M | 113 | 62.83% | 2 270 | 1.52 | 1.01 | 1 | 932 | |||
10 | Объект 261 | 95 | 48.42% | 1 531 | 1.24 | 0.72 | 1 | 690 | |||
10 | Strv 103B | 54 | 46.30% | 2 598 | 2.12 | 1.30 | 770 | ||||
10 | FV215b (183) | 47 | 46.81% | 2 111 | 1.66 | 1.13 | 701 | ||||
10 | TVP T 50/51 | 43 | 48.84% | 2 406 | 1.24 | 0.98 | 838 | ||||
8 | M40/M43 | 38 | 39.47% | 1 275 | 0.44 | 0.29 | 680 | ||||
10 | WZ-111 Qilin | 26 | 53.85% | 1 809 | 1.16 | 0.85 | 775 | ||||
10 | Manticore | 23 | 52.17% | 1 062 | 0.38 | 0.35 | 713 | ||||
10 | Waffenträger auf E 100 | 19 | 63.16% | 2 136 | 2.50 | 1.32 | 788 | ||||
10 | Lion | 15 | 40.00% | 1 124 | 0.27 | 0.20 | 536 | ||||
8 | 122 TM | 13 | 38.46% | 1 508 | 0.80 | 0.62 | 751 | ||||
8 | AMBT | 9 | 22.22% | 914 | 0.50 | 0.44 | 530 | ||||
8 | TST | 9 | 55.56% | 1 615 | 0.50 | 0.33 | 945 | ||||
10 | СУ-122В | 4 | 50.00% | 2 391 | 2.00 | 1.00 | 705 | ||||
8 | Type 63 | 3 | 66.67% | 226 | 0.00 | 0.00 | 474 | ||||
8 | ИСУ-152 Зверобой | 2 | 100.00% | 2 053 | N/D | 2.00 | 1 113 |
Clans History
Clan | Role | Joined | Left | Days in clan |
---|---|---|---|---|
[SHDS] Shadows | Member of this clan at the moment | |||
[3AKAT] Земля | Recruit | 07.03.2022 | 07.03.2022 | 0 |
[MACCA] MACCA | Junior officer | 22.06.2021 | 09.02.2022 | 232 |
[-O0-] Zamolchi | Recruit | 20.06.2021 | 20.06.2021 | 0 |
[LW-DV] Last Word | Recruitment officer | 11.03.2021 | 22.03.2021 | 11 |
[KPI0K] Капитан Крюк | Junior officer | 23.03.2016 | 24.03.2016 | 1 |
[VLGRD] Волгоградский | Private | 10.07.2014 | 21.10.2015 | 468 |